|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 16. Noes 22. Page 5117.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4895.) Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Evans.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 21. Page 2425.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Evans. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2425.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 29. Page 1562.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|