California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill September 1, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011