LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1062
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1062
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1062
Compare Versions
AB1062 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1062 Amended September 1, 2011
AB1062 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1062 Amended April 26, 2011
AB1062 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1062 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1062 Amended September 1, 2011
AB1062 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1062 Amended April 26, 2011
AB1062 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare