|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5883.).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4438.).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 3597.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|