LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1124
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1124
Compare Versions
AB1124 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1124 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1124 Amended June 12, 2012
AB1124 Amended January 13, 2012
AB1124 Amended January 11, 2012
AB1124 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1124 Amended April 7, 2011
AB1124 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1124 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1124 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1124 Amended June 12, 2012
AB1124 Amended January 13, 2012
AB1124 Amended January 11, 2012
AB1124 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1124 Amended April 7, 2011
AB1124 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare