California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill June 12, 2012
Bill January 13, 2012
Bill January 11, 2012
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 7, 2011