|
09/20/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 396, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6496.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4700.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3607.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|