LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1224
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1224
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1224
Compare Versions
AB1224 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB1224 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1224 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1224 Amended June 25, 2012
AB1224 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1224 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1224 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1224 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB1224 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1224 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1224 Amended June 25, 2012
AB1224 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1224 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1224 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare