California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012