|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2565.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2017.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Measure version as amended on July 1 corrected.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Measure version as amended on June 20 corrected.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|