California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill July 13, 2011
Bill July 1, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill May 16, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011