LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1288
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1288
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1288
Compare Versions
AB1288 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB1288 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB1288 Amended July 13, 2011
AB1288 Amended July 1, 2011
AB1288 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1288 Amended May 16, 2011
AB1288 Amended May 4, 2011
AB1288 Amended March 25, 2011
AB1288 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1288 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB1288 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB1288 Amended July 13, 2011
AB1288 Amended July 1, 2011
AB1288 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1288 Amended May 16, 2011
AB1288 Amended May 4, 2011
AB1288 Amended March 25, 2011
AB1288 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare