|
08/31/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1915.).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1854.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1690.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|