BILL NUMBER: AB 1300CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 196 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 31, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 31, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 15, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 3, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 1, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 31, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Blumenfield FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to amend Section 11362.83 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical marijuana. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1300, Blumenfield. Medical marijuana. Existing law establishes the Medical Marijuana Program to exempt certain qualified patients who hold an identification card issued pursuant to the program, and the caregivers of those persons from certain state criminal sanctions related to the possession, cultivation, transportation, processing, or use of limited amounts of marijuana, as specified. The program prohibits certain entities, including a medical marijuana cooperative or collective, from being located within a 600-foot radius of a school. Existing law also specifically provides that these provisions governing the program do not prevent a city or other local governing body from adopting and enforcing laws consistent with the program. This bill would revise the latter provision described above to additionally provide that these provisions shall not prevent a city or other local governing body from adopting and enforcing local ordinances that regulate the location, operation, or establishment of a medical marijuana cooperative or collective, or from the civil or criminal enforcement of those local ordinances. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 11362.83 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 11362.83. Nothing in this article shall prevent a city or other local governing body from adopting and enforcing any of the following: (a) Adopting local ordinances that regulate the location, operation, or establishment of a medical marijuana cooperative or collective. (b) The civil and criminal enforcement of local ordinances described in subdivision (a). (c) Enacting other laws consistent with this article.