California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 31, 2011

Amended

Bill June 1, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011