|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2394.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 1519.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|