California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill August 31, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 1, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011