LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1307
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1307
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1307
Compare Versions
AB1307 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1307 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1307 Amended August 31, 2011
AB1307 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1307 Amended July 1, 2011
AB1307 Amended June 21, 2011
AB1307 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1307 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB1307 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB1307 Amended August 31, 2011
AB1307 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1307 Amended July 1, 2011
AB1307 Amended June 21, 2011
AB1307 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare