|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2866.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2194.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 1698.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|