California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB131 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011
Bill March 17, 2011
Bill March 8, 2011