LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB131
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB131
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB131
Compare Versions
AB131 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB131 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB131 Amended August 30, 2011
AB131 Amended May 27, 2011
AB131 Amended April 6, 2011
AB131 Amended March 17, 2011
AB131 Amended March 8, 2011
AB131 Introduced January 11, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB131 Chaptered October 8, 2011
AB131 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB131 Amended August 30, 2011
AB131 Amended May 27, 2011
AB131 Amended April 6, 2011
AB131 Amended March 17, 2011
AB131 Amended March 8, 2011
AB131 Introduced January 11, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare