|
07/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 155, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5598.).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to the unfinished business file.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alejo.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3958.).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3515.)
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 10).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|