California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1337 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 9, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 23, 2012

Amended

Bill May 25, 2012
Bill January 11, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012