LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1337
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1337
Compare Versions
AB1337 Chaptered July 23, 2012
AB1337 Enrolled July 9, 2012
AB1337 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1337 Amended January 11, 2012
AB1337 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1337 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1337 Chaptered July 23, 2012
AB1337 Enrolled July 9, 2012
AB1337 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1337 Amended January 11, 2012
AB1337 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1337 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare