|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 231, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5946.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4471.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3599.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|