California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill January 12, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill March 31, 2011