LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1345
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1345
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1345
Compare Versions
AB1345 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1345 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1345 Amended June 6, 2012
AB1345 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1345 Amended January 12, 2012
AB1345 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1345 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1345 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1345 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB1345 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB1345 Amended June 6, 2012
AB1345 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1345 Amended January 12, 2012
AB1345 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1345 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1345 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare