|
10/02/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 404, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 3126.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2387.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1639.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|