California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill June 30, 2011
Bill June 14, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 14, 2011