LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB136
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB136
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB136
Compare Versions
AB136 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB136 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB136 Amended September 2, 2011
AB136 Amended August 30, 2011
AB136 Amended June 30, 2011
AB136 Amended June 14, 2011
AB136 Amended April 26, 2011
AB136 Amended March 14, 2011
AB136 Introduced January 12, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB136 Chaptered October 2, 2011
AB136 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB136 Amended September 2, 2011
AB136 Amended August 30, 2011
AB136 Amended June 30, 2011
AB136 Amended June 14, 2011
AB136 Amended April 26, 2011
AB136 Amended March 14, 2011
AB136 Introduced January 12, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare