|
09/10/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2483.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 21. Page 2489.).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2393.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (September 7). Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1572.).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1392.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|