LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1391
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1391
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1391
Compare Versions
AB1391 Amended September 9, 2011
AB1391 Amended September 8, 2011
AB1391 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1391 Enrolled June 28, 2011
AB1391 Introduced February 23, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1391 Amended September 9, 2011
AB1391 Amended September 8, 2011
AB1391 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1391 Enrolled June 28, 2011
AB1391 Introduced February 23, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare