California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1391 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2011

Enrolled

Bill June 28, 2011

Amended

Bill September 9, 2011
Bill September 8, 2011
Bill September 2, 2011