|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2926.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2206.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 983.)
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|