California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill June 14, 2011
Bill June 1, 2011
Bill March 23, 2011