LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1394
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1394
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1394
Compare Versions
AB1394 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB1394 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1394 Amended June 14, 2011
AB1394 Amended June 1, 2011
AB1394 Amended March 23, 2011
AB1394 Introduced February 28, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1394 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB1394 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB1394 Amended June 14, 2011
AB1394 Amended June 1, 2011
AB1394 Amended March 23, 2011
AB1394 Introduced February 28, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare