|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 2386.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1853.).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 1514.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|