California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1400 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill June 16, 2011
Bill June 8, 2011