LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1400
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1400
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1400
Compare Versions
AB1400 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB1400 Enrolled August 16, 2011
AB1400 Amended June 16, 2011
AB1400 Amended June 8, 2011
AB1400 Introduced March 1, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1400 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB1400 Enrolled August 16, 2011
AB1400 Amended June 16, 2011
AB1400 Amended June 8, 2011
AB1400 Introduced March 1, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare