|
02/10/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 3, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3631.).
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 26).
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2681.).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 10.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|