California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill January 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill February 10, 2012

Amended

Bill January 5, 2012
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 17, 2011