LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1413
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1413
Compare Versions
AB1413 Chaptered February 10, 2012
AB1413 Enrolled January 30, 2012
AB1413 Amended January 5, 2012
AB1413 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1413 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1413 Introduced March 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1413 Chaptered February 10, 2012
AB1413 Enrolled January 30, 2012
AB1413 Amended January 5, 2012
AB1413 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1413 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1413 Introduced March 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare