|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6534.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4902.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 4662.)
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|