California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1521 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/21/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1521CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 423 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 21, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 28, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 9, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 14, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Brownley (Coauthor: Assembly Member Alejo) JANUARY 18, 2012 An act to add Section 60640.2 to the Education Code, relating to pupil assessment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1521, Brownley. Standardized Testing and Reporting Program: academic achievement: assessment instrument. Existing law requires the Superintendent of Public Instruction, with approval of the State Board of Education, to develop an Academic Performance Index (API), as part of the Public School Performance Accountability Program, to measure the performance of schools, especially the academic performance of pupils. The Leroy Greene California Assessment of Academic Achievement Act requires the Superintendent to design and implement a statewide pupil assessment program, known as the Standardized Testing and Reporting (STAR) Program. Existing law requires the State Department of Education to develop and adopt primary language assessments that are aligned to the state academic content standards, as specified. This bill would authorize the department, subject to the approval of the state board, to make available to school districts and charter schools a primary language assessment, as specified, that allows school districts and charter schools to assess pupils who are enrolled in a dual language immersion program, as specified, and who are either nonlimited English proficient or redesignated fluent English proficient. The bill would require that a school district or charter school that chooses to administer the primary language assessment do so at its own expense, and enter into an agreement, subject to the approval of the department, with the state testing contractor, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 60640.2 is added to the Education Code, to read: 60640.2. (a) Subject to the approval of the state board, the department may make available to school districts and charter schools a primary language assessment developed pursuant to subparagraph (A) of paragraph (3) of subdivision (f) of Section 60640 for assessing pupils who are enrolled in a dual language immersion program that includes the primary language of the assessment and who are either nonlimited English proficient or redesignated fluent English proficient. The cost for the assessment shall be the same for all school districts and charter schools, and shall not exceed the marginal cost of the assessment, including any cost the department incurs to implement this section. (b) A school district or charter school that chooses to administer a primary language assessment pursuant to this section shall do so at its own expense, and shall enter into an agreement for that purpose with the state testing contractor, as described in subparagraph (C) of paragraph (3) of subdivision (f) of Section 60640, subject to the approval of the department.