LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1521
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1521
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1521
Compare Versions
AB1521 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1521 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1521 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1521 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1521 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1521 Amended June 6, 2012
AB1521 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1521 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1521 Amended March 14, 2012
AB1521 Introduced January 18, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1521 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1521 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1521 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1521 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1521 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1521 Amended June 6, 2012
AB1521 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1521 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1521 Amended March 14, 2012
AB1521 Introduced January 18, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare