|
08/30/2012
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the bill be Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5040.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|