LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1532
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1532
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1532
Compare Versions
AB1532 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1532 Enrolled September 13, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1532 Amended June 18, 2012
AB1532 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1532 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1532 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1532 Chaptered September 30, 2012
AB1532 Enrolled September 13, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 31, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1532 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1532 Amended June 18, 2012
AB1532 Amended May 1, 2012
AB1532 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1532 Introduced January 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare