California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012