|
09/20/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 398, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6054.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4482.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 3. Page 4340.)
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|