LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1550
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1550
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1550
Compare Versions
AB1550 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB1550 Enrolled August 23, 2012
AB1550 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1550 Amended June 28, 2012
AB1550 Amended May 14, 2012
AB1550 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1550 Amended March 12, 2012
AB1550 Introduced January 25, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1550 Chaptered September 20, 2012
AB1550 Enrolled August 23, 2012
AB1550 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1550 Amended June 28, 2012
AB1550 Amended May 14, 2012
AB1550 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1550 Amended March 12, 2012
AB1550 Introduced January 25, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare